Rothman, Laura Giselle (CPSO#: 86677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: Saunders, Laura Giselle (used until: 05 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vaughn Diagnostic Medical Centre
Units 19 - 20
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone: (416) 297-8362
Fax: (416) 840-8434
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA GISELLE ROTHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2012