Rothman, Steven Warren (CPSO#: 66950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 322-3700
Fax: (416) 322-3707
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven Rothman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rothman ( CPSO# 66950 )

Business Address:
202 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 322-2420

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN WARREN ROTHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTHMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1995