Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rotman, Laurie Sue (CPSO#: 52569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
462 Birchmount Road
Unit 34
Scarborough ON  M1K 1N8
Phone: (416) 698-9988
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rotman Akriotis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Akriotis ( CPSO# 57161 )
Dr. L. Rotman ( CPSO# 52569 )

Business Address:
34 - 462 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1K 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 699-4679

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE SUE ROTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985