Rotstein, Coleman Michael Frederick (CPSO#: 31492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
11 P M B 139
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6663
Fax: (416) 340-5442
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 18 Nov 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLEMAN MICHAEL FREDERICK ROTSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988