Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rottapel, Robert Kenneth (CPSO#: 58792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:George Washington University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5420
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Rottapel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rottapel ( CPSO# 58792 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5420

Business Address:
UHN 190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3388

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT KENNETH ROTTAPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTTAPEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1989