Rotundo, Mark John (CPSO#: 66475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vibrant Medical Clinic
2640 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4K 0H3
Phone: 905-553-3730
Fax: (905) 553-3735
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Vaughan Medical Centre
Woodbridge Ontario
3900 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 3G8
Canada
Phone: 905-417-5461
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 4B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 780-9986
Fax: (416) 780-1087
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dufferin Vaughan Medical Clinic
9200 Dufferin Street
Concord ON  L4K 0C6
Canada
Phone: (905) 417-3125
Fax: (905) 417-3105
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Rotundo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rotundo ( CPSO# 66475 )

Business Address:
Marlee Medical Centre
249 Marlee Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 780-9986

Business Address:
3900 Rutherford Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 3G8
Phone Number: (905) 471-5461

Business Address:
9200 Rutherford Road
Concord ON  L4K 0C6
Phone Number: (904) 417-3125

Business Address:
Suite 100
2640 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H3
Phone Number: (905) 553-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOHN ROTUNDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTUNDO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1995