Rouf, Rehana Khatun (CPSO#: 29467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Rd.
Kemptville, Ontario.
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: 613-258-6133
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Almonte General Hospital
75 Spring St.,
Almonte, Ont.
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: 613-256-2500 Ext. 2246
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
Unit 100
1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans Dr
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Canada
Phone: (613) 841-2347
Fax: (613) 841-5359
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
Unit 29
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rehana Rouf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rouf ( CPSO# 29467 )

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
2375 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
Unit 29
1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Business Address:
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
Suite 100
1220 Promenade Place D'Orleans Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 841-2347

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: The Medical Records Department Haldimand War Memorial Hospital 206 John Street Dunnville, Ontario N1A 2P7
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REHANA KHATUN ROUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1977