Roukema, Henry William (CPSO#: 58229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital at LHSC
Room D4 213
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 64363
Fax: (519) 646-6123
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Roukema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Roukema ( CPSO# 58229 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY WILLIAM ROUKEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUKEMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1991