Rourke, James Thomas Bruce (CPSO#: 29197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dsicipline of Family Medicine
Memorial University of Newfoundland
Health Science Centre Room 2701-A
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 864-6549

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES THOMAS BRUCE ROURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROURKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977