Rourke, Timothy Wade (CPSO#: 58412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent CHC
150 Richmond St
Chatham ON  N7M 1N9
Phone: 519-397-5455
Fax: 519-397-5497
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Rourke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 28 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Rourke by: telephone: 613-845-0200, by fax: 613-845-0161, or by e-mail: chartservice.rourke@gmail.com.
Date Received: 09 Mar 2015

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY WADE ROURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROURKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1988