Rousseau, Genevieve Denise (CPSO#: 62242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Origyns Medical Clinic
Suite 205
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 721-2907
Fax: (613) 518-6555
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Rousseau Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rousseau ( CPSO# 62242 )

Business Address:
Origyns Medical Clinic
1355 Bank Street
Suite 205
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 721-2907

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE DENISE ROUSSEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSSEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1992