Roussev, Maria (CPSO#: 51529)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 28 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, German, Russian

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2000