Roussev, Rossen (CPSO#: 55710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
40 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J5
Phone: (416) 445-2811
Fax: (416) 445-2365
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSSEN ROUSSEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUSSEV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1986