Routhier, Shelley Ann Angele (CPSO#: 69343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
688 Emily Street
Hanmer ON  P3P 1E4
Phone: (705) 969-5560
Fax: (705) 969-1402
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLEY ANN ANGELE ROUTHIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUTHIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1997