Rouvinez Bouali, Nicole Genevieve (CPSO#: 72726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Sep 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Lausanne, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neonatology
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-8561
Fax: (613) 737-8889
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71531
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rouvinez Bouali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rouvinez Bouali ( CPSO# 72726 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-8561

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Sep 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Nicole  Genevieve  Rouvinez  Bouali may practise medicine independently in
            paediatrics, only.