Rouzbahman, Marjan (CPSO#: 80350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
Room 11E 215 11th Floor Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4564
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Centre
1 Hospital court
Oshawa
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARJAN ROUZBAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUZBAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008