Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rovis, Katarina (CPSO#: 51531)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Rovis' medical records from 1985 to 2004 are with Dr. Laura Gerber who is located at: Beech Tree Medical Centre Unit 4 700 Guelph Line Burlington, ON L7R 3M8 Tel: (289) 288-0061 Any medical records after 2004 will be stored with: Child and Parent Resource Institute (CPRI) 600 Sanatorium Road London, ON N6H 3W7 Tel: (519) 858-2774
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013