Rowat, Bruce Montgomery Thomas (CPSO#: 29108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1977

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bay Adelaide Centre
West Tower Suite 1500
333 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Phone: (416) 350-8142
Fax: (416) 915-0885
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Centre Bank of Montreal
B1 Level First Canadian Place
Toronto ON  M5X 1A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-6777
Fax: (416) 867-7293
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE MONTGOMERY THOMAS ROWAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWAT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1977

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)