Rowe, Peter Courtney (CPSO#: 58889)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 May 2007