Rowed, David Watson (CPSO#: 22756)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 19 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017