Rowhani-Seki, Neda (CPSO#: 66874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: Seki, Neda (used until: 13 Feb 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St. West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: (705) 325-9402
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.T. Seki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seki ( CPSO# 66811 )
Dr. N. Rowhani-Seki ( CPSO# 66874 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
Unit 3
4337 Burnside Line
Orillia ON  L3V 0W1
Phone Number: (705) 325-6805

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Feb 2001 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEDA ROWHANI-SEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROWHANI-SEKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 07 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2001