Roy, Deborah May (CPSO#: 27741)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah M. Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 7 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: University of Waterloo Health Services 200 University Avenue West Waterloo ON N2L 3G1
Date Received: 11 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016