Roy, Eric (CPSO#: 78281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005