Roy, George Alexander (CPSO#: 42314)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004