Roy, Jean A (CPSO#: 59095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
745 Montreal Road
Suite 101b
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone: (613) 749-4429
Fax: (613) 749-7942
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean A. Roy Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Roy ( CPSO# 59095 )

Business Address:
Suite 101b
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone Number: (613) 749-4429

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN A ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1987