Roy, Josee-Anne (CPSO#: 66015)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Apr 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Montreal, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 1993 to 15 Apr 1994
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 1994