Roy, Lauri Jeanne (CPSO#: 58503)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2001