Roy, Madan Mohan (CPSO#: 64517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Bangalore University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
3A93
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75689
Fax: (905) 521-4981
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Madan Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy ( CPSO# 64517 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADAN MOHAN ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1996