Roy, Marc Joseph (CPSO#: 67950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West End Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC JOSEPH ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996