Roy, Marie Lessard (CPSO#: 32873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Don Mills Eglinton Medical Centre
29 Gervais Drive
Suite 100
Don Mills ON  M3C 1Z1
Phone: (416) 449-5511
Fax: (416) 449-9334
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie L. Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy ( CPSO# 32873 )

Business Address:
Don Mills-Eglinton Medical Centre
100 - 29 Gervais Drive
North York ON  M3C 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 449-5511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE LESSARD ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1981