Roy, Peter Douglas (CPSO#: 53566)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Weeneebaylo General Hospital Moose Factory, Ontario P0L 1W0
Date Received: 29 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013