Roy, Rashmin Anilkumar (CPSO#: 90269)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Gujarat University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2009 to 06 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009