Roy, Robert John (CPSO#: 27203)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Roy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2014