Roy, William Andrew (CPSO#: 23704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Brooklin Medical Centre
Suite 1A
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone: (905) 655-3321
Fax: (905) 655-4848
Electoral District: 05

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 8, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. William Andrew Roy in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Roy to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. WILLIAM ANDREW ROY
                                              ("Dr. Roy")
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                          
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Roy, certificate of registration number 23704, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that the College received information from the
                  NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215621 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective immediately 
                  upon the signing of this Undertaking.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Roy, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of                                              
                              tablets
                               to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N); 
                        (vi)  Dr. Roy's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below).
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (7)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of twelve (12) months on the terms
                        set out below (the "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of Clinical
                        Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon recommendation
                        of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
            Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")

                  (c)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision
                        for a minimum of four (4) weeks on the terms set out below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Roy, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every week to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                              i.    20 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                    narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled
                                    drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances,
                                    and all other monitored drugs since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if there are not 20
                                    patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review, then the charts
                                    of all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                  
                              ii.   the chart of every patient to whom I have initiated a
                                    new prescription for narcotic drugs, narcotic
                                    preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and
                                    other targeted substances, and/or all other monitored
                                    drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two weeks.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that after a minimum of four (4) weeks of
                        Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
            Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")

                  (h)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Roy, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a 
                        minimum of three (3) months on the terms set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Roy, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at
                        least once every two weeks to discuss the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                        review of:
                  
                              i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                    narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled
                                    drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances,
                                    and all other monitored drugs since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if there are not 15
                                    patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review, then the charts
                                    of all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                  
                              ii.   the chart of every patient to whom I have initiated a
                                    new prescription for narcotic drugs, narcotic
                                    preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and
                                    other targeted substances, and/or all other monitored
                                    drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review. 
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two weeks.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that after a minimum of three (3) months of
                        Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that the level of supervision may be
                        reduced.
                  
            Phase 3 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 3")

                  (m)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Roy, undertake to engage in Phase 3 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of eight (8) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (n)   During Phase 3, I, Dr. Roy, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        (i)   15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed narcotic
                              drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs,
                              benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and all other
                              monitored drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if there are not 15 patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, then the charts of all patients listed in the
                              Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review;
                              and
                  
                        (ii)  the chart of every patient to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations,
                              controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other  targeted
                              substances, and/or all other monitored drugs since the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review.
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr.Roy, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) have reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that after a minimum of eight (8) months of
                        Phase 3, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice without
                        supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to the
                        College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical Supervision
                        will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        and approval by the College.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        location approved by the College;
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the medical inspectors dated December 16, 2016, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (v)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (w)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (x)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within fourteen (14)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (y)   I, Dr. Roy, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (7)(w) and/or (x)
                        above, I will cease prescribing narcotic drugs, narcotic
                        preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted
                        substances, and all other monitored drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (z)   I, Dr. Roy, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs,
                        benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and all other
                        monitored drugs as a result of section (7)(y) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F",
                        including but not limited to, the following elements of
                        professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  Review  and discuss with supervisor the CPSO Policy
                              "Prescribing
                              Drugs":http://www.cpso.on.ca/PoliciesPublications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                  
                        (iii) Review  and discuss with supervisor the article on Preventing
                              the misuse 
                              of opioids 
                                    
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
                  
                        (iv)  Review and discuss with supervisor the  following clinical
                              guideline:
                  
                                    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer  Pain :
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/opioid;
                  
                        (v)   Enroll and successfully complete the following online module:
                              CAMH Safe and Effective use of Opioids for Chronic Non-cancer
                              Pain Online Course
                                    
                                    http://www.camh.ca/en/education/about/AZCourses/Pages/safer_odt.aspx;
                  
                        (vi)  University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Medical
                              Record Keeping: http://www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/;
                  
                        (vii) Review and discuss with supervisor the CPSO Policy "Medical
                              Records":  http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies
                              Publications/Policy/Medical-Records; and
                  
                        (viii)any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake that, approximately six (6) months  after the
                        Clinical Supervision set out under section 7 of the Undertaking has
                        ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Reassessment").
                  
                   (b)  I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include
                        a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the terms of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Roy, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Roy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (d)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H", respectively. 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of
                  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation
                  of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Roy, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with the section above, the following summary
                        shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information from the Narcotics
                              Monitoring System about Dr. Roy's prescribing of controlled
                              substances, including narcotics.
                  
                              Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                              investigation into whether Dr. Roy failed to maintain the
                              standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent
                              in his prescribing of controlled substances, including
                              narcotics.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    "Dr. Roy's prescribing of controlled substances,
                                    including narcotics, will be supervised by a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of
                                    twelve (12) months. 
                  
                                    "Dr. Roy will engage in professional education in the
                                    prescribing of controlled substances, including
                                    narcotics.
                  
                                    "Following the professional education and period of
                                    supervision, Dr. Roy's prescribing of controlled
                                    substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by
                                    an assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Roy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Roy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Roy, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: June 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. William Andrerw Roy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 8, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Roy’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Roy failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Roy’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of twelve (12) months.

Dr. Roy will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Roy’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.