Roy-Boulos, Anne-Marie (CPSO#: 29796)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Roy, Anne-Marie (used until: 03 Jul 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seen in Ottawa: UOHS,100 Marie Curie, Ottawa ON K1N 6N5 Tel: (613) 564-3950 Fax: (613) 564-6627 Patients seen on Kent St: Docudavit Solutions, 28 Eugene St, Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 10 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Mar 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015