Roy-Lacroix, Marie-Eve (CPSO#: 97098)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014