Rozario, Duncan Robert (CPSO#: 65381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical Centre
3075 Hospital Gate, Suite #216
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 845-3614
Fax: (905) 845-4310
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duncan Rozario Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rozario ( CPSO# 65381 )

Business Address:
North Oakville Medical Centre
Suite 216
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 845-3614

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUNCAN ROBERT ROZARIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZARIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1993