Roze, Gundars Edgars (CPSO#: 68164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2110
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gundars Roze Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Roze ( CPSO# 68164 )
Dr. J. Boyd ( CPSO# 91382 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Toronto ON  L4Z 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Unit 4
8 York Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 366-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUNDARS EDGARS ROZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)