Rozenberg, Anna (CPSO#: 84341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5508
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Rozenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rozenberg ( CPSO# 84341 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA ROZENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 05 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 06 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2011