Rozental-Klinger, Emmanuel Eduardo (CPSO#: 63241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Campbellton Regional Hospital
189 Lily Lake Road
Campbellton NB  B3N 3H3
Phone: (506) 789-5000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMANUEL EDUARDO ROZENTAL-KLINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROZENTAL-KLINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998