Rubab, Faria (CPSO#: 104186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
303
510 Southdale Rd East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone: 519 8503999
Fax: 519-9371693
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Faria Rubab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rubab ( CPSO# 104186)

Business Address:
510 Southdale Road East
Suite 303
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 850-3999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARIA RUBAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBAB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016