Rubaiyyat, Tania (CPSO#: 81377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Dhaka, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Health care London
Family medical center
PO box 5777, Stn B
London ON  N6A4V2
Phone: (519) 672-9660
Fax: (519) 672-7727
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Highbury Medical Clinic Inc
1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E3
Canada
Phone: (519) 659-2331
Fax: (519) 659-4617
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubaiyyat & Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rahman ( CPSO# 92205 )
Dr. T. Rubaiyyat ( CPSO# 81377 )

Business Address:
St Joseph Family Medical Centre
PO Box 5777
STN B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 672-9660

Business Address:
Highbury Medical Clinic Inc
1345 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E3
Phone Number: (519) 659-2331

Business Address:
1135 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 5K7
Phone Number: (519) 438-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANIA RUBAIYYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBAIYYAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006