Rubens, Mark Julian (CPSO#: 60356)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2012