Rubin, Barry Broidy (CPSO#: 56697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Vascular Surgery Division
6 E N - 224
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3645
Fax: (416) 340-5029
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Rubin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rubin ( CPSO# 56697 )

Business Address:
The Toronto General Hospital
Vascular Surgery Division
6 E N - 224
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3645

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY BROIDY RUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987