Rubin, Steven Zalman (CPSO#: 29852)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Hebrew

Education:University of Cape Town, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario 401 Smyth Road Ottawa, Ontario K1H 8L1
Date Received: 09 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 19 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012