Rubin, Yair (CPSO#: 73006)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 1998 to 09 Oct 1998
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000