Rubio Gomez, Gustavo Adolfo (CPSO#: 95554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-4588
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUSTAVO ADOLFO RUBIO GOMEZ shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RUBIO GOMEZ is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. RUBIO GOMEZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RUBIO GOMEZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RUBIO GOMEZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RUBIO GOMEZ is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RUBIO GOMEZ no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018