Ruby, Tamara (CPSO#: 62376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: Grossman, Tamara (used until: 01 Jun 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMARA RUBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1991