Rucker, Christian Josef (CPSO#: 67545)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 1998 to 11 Dec 1998
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 1998