Rucker, Joshua Charles Samuel (CPSO#: 76361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
c/o Josephine Sham
Suite 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5270
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.C.S. Rucker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rucker ( CPSO# 76361 )
Dr. J. Tesler ( CPSO# 81496 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
3EN-462 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
Suite 600
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA CHARLES SAMUEL RUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUCKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006